Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title NORDLICHT v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02849
Date Filed2019-09-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffMARK NORDLICHT
Case DescriptionMark Norlicht submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning communications between former SEC Director of Enforcement Andrew Ceresny and members of the media from January 2014 to December 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Norlicht that there were 6180 potentially responsive emails. He agreed to narrow the time frame and the publications for which he was seeking records. The agency indicated that it was processing his request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Norlicht filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-231COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100748) filed by MARK NORDLICHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-23SUMMONS (3) Issued as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-252STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/25/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-253RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/24/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/24/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2019.) (ztth) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-10-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 9/26/2019. (ztth) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar