Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBIRD v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02860
Date Filed2019-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffKAI BIRD
Case DescriptionKai Bird, a historian and journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning a 1980 cable sent by the U.S. Embassy in Madrid pertaining to an unofficial visit by William Casey, who at the time was Ronald Reagan's campaign manager. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bird filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-241COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6395547) filed by KAI BIRD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-26Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-103NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-104GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/10/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/03/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/2/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/3/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavits of Mailing)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar