Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTOP GEOENGINEERING MINNESOTA v. U.S. AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02869
Date Filed2019-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffSTOP GEOENGINEERING MINNESOTA a project of the non-profit Minnesota Natural Health Coalition, a non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionStop Geoengineering Minnesota submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Air Force for records concerning the agency's involvement in weather modification. SGM also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SGM filed administrative appeals. After hearing nothing more pertaining to any of its requests, SGM filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAIR FORCE an agency of the United States of America
DefendantU.S. AIR FORCE an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-241COMPLAINT against AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6396195) filed by STOP GEOENGINEERING MINNESOTA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Air Force proposed summons, # 3 Summons Attorney General proposed summons, # 4 Summons US Attorney proposed summons)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STOP GEOENGINEERING MINNESOTA (Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-243MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Gaffney, :Firm- Law Offices of Brian Gaffney APC, :Address- 446 Old County Road, Suite 100-310, Pacifica, CA 94044. Phone No. - (650) 219 3187. Fax No. - N/A Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6396393. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STOP GEOENGINEERING MINNESOTA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declration of Brian Gaffney to Appear Pro Hoc Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to allow Brian Gaffney to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-26Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-27MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 27, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2019. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21//2019. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AIR FORCE served on 10/21/2019 (Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-278NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of U.S. AIR FORCE (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/27/2019)
2019-11-209ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AIR FORCE.(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 4, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report on or before March 11, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2019. (lcdlf2); Modified on 11/21/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-21NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re MINUTE ORDER, Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report on or before March 11, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2019, was entered in error. (ztth) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-12-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by STOP GEOENGINEERING MINNESOTA. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 3, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 5, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-06NOTICE OF ERROR re 10 Status Report; emailed to davebahr@mindspring.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE - Attorney signature must match login/password. (zeg, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2020-01-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
2020-01-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 6, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 31, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 10, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-3113Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 2, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 3, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-03-0214Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 1, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 2, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-04-0215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 22, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 2, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/22/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-2216Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 2, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 22, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-06-0217Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AIR FORCE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 15, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 2, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar