Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. Department of the Interior
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.2.2 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2019cv00369
Date Filed2019-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Candy W. Dale
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionWestern Watersheds Project submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's outcome-based grazing initiative and 11 projects implementing the program in six states. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WWP filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing, WWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-241COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1943917.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Supplement Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lake, Scott)
2019-09-242MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David A. Bahr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1943939.)Scott Lake appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Lake, Scott)
2019-09-253DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
2019-09-254Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
2019-10-185LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on January 8, 2020, at 10:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before January 2, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
2019-10-186Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Lake, Scott)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar