Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al.
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv08905
Date Filed2019-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Assistance Project submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and the Department of State for records concerning guidance provided for working with refugees. IRAP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Both agents granted IRAP's request for a fee waiver. USCIS did not respond to IRAP's request for expedited processing, while the State Department denied IRAP's expedited processing request. IRAP filed an administrative appeal the denial. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [14]
Opinion/Order [18]
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-251COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17661556)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-252FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Meyer, Kathryn) Modified on 9/26/2019 (pc). (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-253RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project.(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-254FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Meyer, Kathryn) Modified on 9/26/2019 (pc). (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State, International Refugee Assistance Project. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties if US Defendant Basis of Jurisdiction is selected. (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kathryn Claire Meyer to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Only parties listed on the complaint caption title can be issued a summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-26CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-26Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-26Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-265CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-266REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-277ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State. (dnh) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-028AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; United States Department of State served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-219MOTION for Justin Bryan Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17807982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Cox, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-2910NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ruth Friedman on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State. (Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-0411ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State.(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0412NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariko Hirose on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project. (Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-1813RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project.(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/19/2019. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-11-2014ORDER: The parties should submit a status report to the Court by December 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/19/2019) (ks) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2115ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 9 Motion for Justin Bryan Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/20/2019) (ks) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-12-0616STATUS REPORT. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project.(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Status Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2020-01-0817STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State.(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2020. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1418ORDER: A conference in this case is scheduled for January 20, 2020 at 4:30 PM. Agency counsel for United States Citizenship and Immigration Services is directed to appear. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/13/2020) ( Status Conference set for 1/20/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.)(ks) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-1519ORDER: The conference in this matter will be held on January 21, 2020 at 4:30 PM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/15/2020) ( Status Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.)(ks) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-1720LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated January 17, 2020 re: Update Regarding USCIS Production. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State.(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Status Conference held on 1/21/2020. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-01-2221ORDER: The parties should give the Court a status report by January 28, 2020 setting out their respective positions with respect to the acceleration of the production of documents. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/21/2020) (ks) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-2722CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated January 27, 2020. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State.(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-2823ORDER granting 22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/28/2020) (va) Modified on 2/5/2020 (va). (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-02-1024CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Kathryn C. Meyer dated 02/10/2020. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Meyer, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-1125ORDER granting 24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/11/2020) (ks) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-1826TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/21/2020 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-1827NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/21/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-03-1328STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-04-0229LETTER MOTION to Stay existing deadlines for processing and producing FOIA documents in light of the COVID-19 pandemic's effect on State's operations addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated April 2, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration).(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0230ORDER granting 29 Letter Motion to Stay. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/2/2020) (ks) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-02Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ks) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0831CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on FOIA Monthly Production Deadlines, Joint Status Report addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated April 8, 2020. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-0932ORDER granting 31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/9/2020) (rro) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-05-2633LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated May 26, 2020. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-06-0134STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of State..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-02Status Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.The call-in number for the teleconference is (888)-363-4749 and the access code is 8140049. (Addelson, Jacob; Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0235STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0536ORDER terminating 33 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties should advise the Court about the status of this case by June 12, 2020. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 33. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/5/2020) (ks) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Status Conference held on 6/5/2020. All parties present. (tro) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-1137LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated June 11, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of State..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-1138ORDER granting 37 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Rebecca R. Friedman dated June 11, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of State. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/11/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-1939STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of State..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar