Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02902
Date Filed2019-09-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the appointment of Elizabeth Warren as an advisor during the creation of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Citizens United that its request was being placed on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6402294) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons to AG, # 5 Summons to Treasury, # 6 Summons to USA)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-30Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-304Case randomly reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-085STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/08/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-11-066ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-08MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than December 4, 2019. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/8/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 12/4/2019 (mac) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar