Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEcological Rights Foundation v. United States Air Force
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv06150
Date Filed2019-09-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vince Chhabria
PlaintiffEcological Rights Foundation a non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionThe Ecological Rights Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Air Force for records concerning former EPA administrator Scott Pruitt's use of Air Force planes for international travel. After hearing nothing further from the agency the Ecological Rights Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-271COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Air Force, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 13745230). Filed by Ecological Rights Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - ERF FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ERF Fee Waiver Request, # 3 Exhibit 3 - ERF Request Transmittal, # 4 Summons U.S. Air Force, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2019) Modified on 10/1/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-272Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Ecological Rights Foundation (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-273Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-274CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ecological Rights Foundation.. (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-305CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-306ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 09/30/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-307REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-018Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Air Force. (Attachments: #(1) Summons, #(2) Summons) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar