Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Customs and Border Protection
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv09017
Date Filed2019-09-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge James L. Cott
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCaitlin H. Dickerson
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Caitlin Dickerson submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. The first FOIA request asked for records sent by supervisors to staff in the El Paso sector concerning references to family separation and zero tolerance. The second FOIA request asked for the same types of records nationwide. Dickerson requested expedited processing and a fee waiver for both requests. The agency granted Dickerson's request for a fee waiver but denied her request for expedited processing. The agency subsequently told Dickerson that her nationwide request had been closed as being duplicative of an earlier request. The New York Times then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCustoms and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-271COMPLAINT against Customs and Border Protection. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17677438)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Caitlin Dickerson.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-272CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-273RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-274REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Caitlin Dickerson, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-275NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Robinson Green on behalf of Caitlin Dickerson, The New York Times Company. (Green, Dana) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-276NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Perloff-Giles on behalf of Caitlin Dickerson, The New York Times Company. (Perloff-Giles, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-30***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Caitlin Dickerson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-30***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-30CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-30Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-30Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-307ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Customs and Border Protection. (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-018INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/1/2019) (mro) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-019ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/1/2019) (mro) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-3010NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Salim Jacob on behalf of Customs and Border Protection. (Jacob, Charles) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-0111CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Charles S. Jacob dated November 1, 2019. Document filed by Customs and Border Protection.(Jacob, Charles) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0112ORDER granting 11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The extension request to file an answer by November 20 is approved. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0413CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Customs and Border Protection, Caitlin H. Dickerson, The New York Times Company. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/4/2019) (cf) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar