Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02928
Date Filed2019-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation for records concerning Elizabeth Warren's appointment to the agency's advisory committee on economic inclusion and records generated during her tenure on the committee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-301COMPLAINT against FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6407800) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons to the Attorney General, # 5 Summons to the FDIC, # 6 Summons to the U.S. Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-02Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-034NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar