Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02931
Date Filed2019-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffINTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Assistance Project submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the role of state and local jurisdictions in refugee resettlement and two other categories of records. IRAP also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied IRAP's request for expedited processing. It told IRAP that its request was being put on the complex track for processing. IRAP filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6408146) filed by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-302CIVIL COVER SHEET by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT filed by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT.(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-303REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT.(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-024MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Justin B. Cox, :Firm- International Refugee Assistance Project, :Address- P.O. Box 170208, Atlanta, GA 30317. Phone No. - (516) 701-4233. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6413095. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin B. Cox)(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-025MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Melissa S. Keaney, :Firm- International Refugee Assistance Project, :Address- P.O. Box 2291, Fair Oaks, CA 95628. Phone No. - (916) 546-6125. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6413121. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa S. Keaney)(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-036ERRATA by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT 1 Complaint filed by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-05Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/05/2019)
2019-10-087SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-188AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Serena Kumalmaz) by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT. (Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-21MINUTE ORDER: Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Melissa S. Keaney is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a).For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/21/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Justin B. Cox is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/30/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-049NOTICE of Appearance by Justin B. Cox on behalf of INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Cox, Justin) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-2510NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-2511ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 1/3/20. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/2/19. (DJS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar