Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMoore v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityEl Paso
Case Number3:2019cv00279
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David C Guaderrama
PlaintiffRobert Moore
Case DescriptionRobert Moore, a journalist covering immigration issues in El Paso, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the detention of immigrants seeking asylum in the El Paso area. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Moore filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Proctection
DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [73]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12674340). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Robert Moore.(Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-01Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-01If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-01https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/index.html (scf) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-023REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-034Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (em) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-035Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, C/O. Office of the General Counsel (em) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-036Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, c/o Attorney General, Washington, D.C. (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-037Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, c/o. Ms. Stephanie Rico Civil Process Clerk (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-038Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, c/o Office of the General Counsel, Washington, DC. (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-039Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, c/o Attorney General of the United States. (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-0310Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, c/o Ms. Stephanie Rico Civil Process Clerk. (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-0311Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, c/o General Counsel, Washington, DC. (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-0312Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Attorney General of the United States, C/O Attorney General of the United States, Washington, DC. (em) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-1013SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Customs and Border Proctection served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-1114SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-11-0615Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-1816Order Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-12-0417SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0418SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0419SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Customs and Border Proctection served on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0420SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0421SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0422SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-1723Proposed Scheduling Order by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-1724Scheduling Recommendations Joint Report by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-1825SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge David C Guaderrama, Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2020 02:00 PM before Judge David C Guaderrama, Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2020, Discovery due by 6/29/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 3/17/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2020,. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-1826MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Robert Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-2727Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 12/27/2019)
2019-12-30Text Order GRANTING 27 UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 12/30/2019)
2020-01-0928Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of time by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-10Text Order GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-1729ADR Report Filed - Joint by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-1730Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline for Defendants' to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Defendants' Status Report by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-2131ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion to Stay; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings" (ECF No. 26) is STAYED until further order from the Court; IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants SHALL file written status reports relating to their production of records to Plaintiff on February 24, 2020, April 3,2020, and every thirty(30) days thereafter. Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21ORDER HELD IN ABEYANCE 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-02-2432STATUS REPORT Pursuant to January 21, 2020 Order by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-03-0433Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Guaderrama: Docket Call held on 3/4/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter K. Supnet.)(em) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-3134DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Robert Moore. (Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-0335STATUS REPORT DEFENDANTS' APRIL 3, 2020 by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-3036DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-0437NOTICE Parties' May 14, 2020 Status Report by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 31 Order on Motion to Stay,, (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-2238OMNIBUS ORDER CANCELLING JUNE 2020 DOCKET CALLS IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-0339NOTICE Defendants' June 3, 2020 Status Report by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 31 Order on Motion to Stay,, (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-2540MOTION for Protective Order Against Discovery by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-0141Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Robert Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-0142Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 40 MOTION for Protective Order Against Discovery by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02Text Order GRANTING 42 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant CBP's Motion and Memorandum for Protective Order Against Discovery 40 is hereby WITHDRAWN, without prejudice to refiling. entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-02Text Order WITHDRAWING 40 Motion for Protective Order. See ECF No. 42 . entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(pc) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-0243ORDER GRANTING 41 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines ; IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for designation of Plaintiff Robert Moores testifying experts is extended from March 31, 2020, see Scheduling Order at 1, ECF No. 25, to the earlier of the following: (1) the date that Plaintiff files a Motion for Summary Judgment; or (2) the date that Plaintiff files a response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that either party may designate rebuttal expert declarations within fifteen (15) days following receipt of any declarations or report of the opposing expert.Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-0644NOTICE Defendants' July 6, 2020 Status Report by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 31 Order on Motion to Stay,, (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-0845NOTICE Defendants' Amended July 6, 2020 Status Report Pursuant to January 21, 2020 Order by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 44 Notice (Other) (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-0846Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of deadline for Defendants HHS and CBP to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Compel Defendants to comply with a finite production schedule by Robert Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coyle, Lynn) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-1547Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of deadline for Defendants HHS and CBP to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Compel Defendants to comply with a finite production schedule by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-16Text Order GRANTING 47 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's motion 46 is now July 22, 2020. entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-2248RESPONSE to Motion, filed by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re 46 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of deadline for Defendants HHS and CBP to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Compel Defendants to comply with a finite production schedule filed by Plaintiff Robert Moore (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2649REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Robert Moore, re 46 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay of deadline for Defendants HHS and CBP to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Compel Defendants to comply with a finite production schedule filed by Plaintiff Robert Moore (Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2020)
2020-08-0550NOTICE Defendant's August 5, 2020 Status Report Pursuant to January 21, 2020 Order by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
2020-08-1051MEMORANDUM ORDER and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 46 Motion to Lift Stay; Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-1452STATUS REPORT Defendant CBP's August 14, 2020 Status Report Pursuant to August 10, 2020 Memorandum Order by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-2053OMNIBUS ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 2020 DOCKET CALLS IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-2854Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Continue Trial Date by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-3155AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and GRANTING 54 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Bench Trial set for 3/15/2021 09:00 AM before Judge David C Guaderrama, Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2021 02:00 PM before Judge David C Guaderrama, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/2/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2020. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-0456STATUS REPORT Defendants' September 4, 2020 by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-11-10Text Order HOLDING 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings IN ABEYANCE until further order from the Court pursuant to the Court's January 21st Order (ECF No. 31 ). entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-1857OMNIBUS ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 2020 DOCKET CALLS. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-1958Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant CBP's Opposed Motion for Open America Stay and Extension of Finite Production Schedule, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-20Text Order GRANTING 58 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-2059DEFENDANT CBPS OPPOSED MOTION FOR OPEN AMERICA STAY ANDEXTENSION OF FINITE PRODUCTION SCHEDULE, by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (em) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-2060Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant HHS'S Unnoposed Motion for Extension of Finite Production Schedule by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-2361Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION to Stay by Robert Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-2362ORDER GRANTING 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services SHALL finish processing and producing all responsive records relevant to Plaintiff Robert Moores request 18-F-0410 no later than January 11, 2020. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-24Text Order GRANTING 61 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-12-0763Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Robert Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pl's Resp to Mot for Open America Stay, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Mot for Leave, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed order to mot for Open America Stay)(Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-08Text Order GRANTING 63 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-0864Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Robert Moore, re 59 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection (em) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-1465Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 64 Response in Opposition to Motion by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-15Text Order GRANTING 65 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant CBP SHALL file its Reply no later than December 23, 2020. entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-2366Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Attachments: # 1 DEFENDANT CBP'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CBP'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR OPEN AMERICA STAY AND EXTENSION OF FINITE PRODUCTION SCHEDULE, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Howard, # 3 Exhibit Backlog Reduction Plan, # 4 Exhibit OIG Report)(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-28Text Order GRANTING 66 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-2867DEFENDANT CBP'S REPLY'S to Response to Motion, filed by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, re 59 OPPOSED MOTION FOR OPEN AMERICA Stay and Extension of Finite Production Schedule filed by Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Proctection (em) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-2968Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to CBP's Reply in support of its Motion for Open America Stay by Robert Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Surreply)(Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29Text Order GRANTING 68 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-3069PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY TO DEFENDANT CBPS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO CBPS OPPOSED MOTION FOR OPEN AMERICA STAY AND EXTENSION OF FINITE PRODUCTION SCHEDULE, filed by Robert Moore; re 59 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Proctection (em) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-0570ADVISORY TO THE COURT by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection . (Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-0771Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant CBP's Surreply to Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to CBP's Opposed Motion for Open America Stay and Extension of Finite Production Schedule by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Surreply)(Romero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-07Text Order GRANTING 71 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-0772DEFENDANT CBPS SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTSREPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO CBPS OPPOSED MOTION FOR OPEN AMERICA STAY AND EXTENSION OF FINITE PRODUCTION SCHEDULE re 59 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant filed by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection (em) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-1273MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; IT IS ORDERED that CBPs Motion for Open America Stay and Extension of Finite Production Schedule (ECF No. 59) is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/2/2021 09:00 AM via Zoom before Judge David C Guaderrama,). Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar