Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02960
Date Filed2019-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State. The first FOIA request asked for records concerning consideration by the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States pertaining to the Ukrainian company Burisma Holdings. The second FOIA request asked for records concerning the consideration by the Committee pertaining to the Chinese company Bohai Harvest RST. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6412546) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-023CIVIL COVER SHEET by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-07Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-074SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-085STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 8, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-11-157ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Luh, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-15Minute Order (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff to show cause, by November 22, 2019, why this case should not be consolidated with 19-cv-2961 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42; and further DIRECTING defendant to file, by November 26, 2019, any reply to the plaintiffs response. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 15, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Show Cause due by 11/22/2019; defendant's reply, if any, due by 11/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar