Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02974
Date Filed2019-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Carlsbad Resource Management Plan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-031COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6415534) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of the Interior, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-032MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allyson A. Beasley, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 208 Paseo del Pueblo Sur, Unit 602, Taos, New Mexico 87571. Phone No. - 575-224-6260. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6415684. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-033LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-08Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-084SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-09MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit the following link: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/9/2019. (lccrc3) Modified on 10/9/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-165NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Beasley on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Beasley, Allyson) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-11-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 10/15/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-149ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by Thursday, December 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/14/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/5/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar