Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSAVAGE v. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02983
Date Filed2019-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCOURTLAND SAVAGE
Case DescriptionCourtland Savage, an African American student pilot with the Navy, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning an investigation report on allegations of racial discrimination that resulted in Savage resigning from the Navy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Navy disclosed a heavily redacted copy of the report, claiming Exemption 3 (other statutes), Exemption 5 (privileges), and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Savage filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The Navy upheld the denial. Savage then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6416759) filed by Courtland Savage. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-09Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-11-143NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-154Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-19MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by December 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/19/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-12-175Consent MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS by COURTLAND SAVAGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay. The proceedings are hereby STAYED pending resolution of plaintiff's administrative appeal. The parties must inform the Court within three business days of the administrative decision. At that time, the parties must also provide a proposed schedule for further proceedings. The parties must file a status report on March 2, 2020 if there has been no notice in the interim. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/19/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-03-026Joint STATUS REPORT by COURTLAND SAVAGE. (Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-02MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another status report by May 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/2/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-05-017Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-06MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file another status report by June 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/6/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-06-018Joint STATUS REPORT by COURTLAND SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report 8 , the Court will adopt the following schedule: (1) Plaintiff's supplemental complaint is due on June 22, 2020. (2) Defendant's answer is due on July 6, 2020. (3) Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on August 6, 2020. (4) Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment, to be supported by a single memorandum of law, is due on September 4, 2020. (5) Defendant's reply and cross-opposition, to be supported by a single memorandum of law, is due on September 18, 2020. (6) Plaintiff's cross-reply is due on October 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/2/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Supplemental Complaint is due by 6/22/2020. (jth) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-04MINUTE ORDER. The Court's minute order granting a stay of the case on December 19, 2019 is hereby lifted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/4/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-229Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint by COURTLAND SAVAGE (Attachments: # 1 First Supplemental Complaint, # 2 First Supplemental Complaint (Redline Comparison))(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the First Supplemental Complaint [9-1]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/22/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2210First AMENDED(SUPPLEMENTAL) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY filed by COURTLAND SAVAGE.(zjf) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-07-0211Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-06MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must file its answer by July 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/6/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-2712ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-08-0613MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Lt. Clayton S. McCarl, III & Exhibits, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-09-0314Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by COURTLAND SAVAGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-03MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is due on September 8, 2020. Defendant's reply and cross-opposition is due on September 22, 2020, and plaintiff's cross-reply is due on October 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/3/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-0815Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COURTLAND SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition and ISO, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 PE1, # 5 PE2, # 6 PE3, # 7 PE4, # 8 PE5, # 9 PE6, # 10 PE7, # 11 PE8)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-0916Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by COURTLAND SAVAGE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition and ISO, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 PE1, # 5 PE2, # 6 PE3, # 7 PE4, # 8 PE5, # 9 PE6, # 10 PE7, # 11 PE8)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-2217Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts (In Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts))(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-2218REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-10-0619REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COURTLAND SAVAGE. (Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-11-23MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that in order to assist the Court in making a responsible de novo determination, defendant is directed to deliver to chambers for in camera inspection the documents that have been withheld from plaintiff or that have been provided to plaintiff with redactions, on or before December 7, 2020. See Ray v. Turner, 587 F.2d 1187, 1195 (D.C. Cir. 1978). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/23/2020. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-12-0720NOTICE of In Camera Submission by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY re Order,, Set Deadlines, (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2021-09-0821ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, defendant's motion for summary judgment 13 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 15 is also GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/2021. (lcabj1) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-0822MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/2021. (lcabj1) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar