Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02984
Date Filed2019-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Postal Service for records concerning a registration or detention program for Muslims in the event of the authorization of military force against any nation. Eddington also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Eddington that it was too broad to allow for a search. Eddington filed an administrative appeal of the decision. He was told that his appeal was closed but did not receive a final letter for the agency. Eddington then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6417018) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-032NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-11-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 10/15/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/14/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar