Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNorthwest Environmental Advocates v. United States Natural Resources Conservation Service
DistrictEastern District of Washington
CitySpokane
Case Number2:2019cv00336
Date Filed2019-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rosanna Malouf Peterson
PlaintiffNorthwest Environmental Advocates an Oregon non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionNorthwest Environmental Advocates submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Natural Resources Conservation Service for records concerning the control of polluted run-off from agriculture in Washington. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided an interim response of 148 pages. The agency sent its final response withholding 293 pages. NWEA filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NWEA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Natural Resources Conservation Service an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-031COMPLAINT against United States Natural Resources Conservation Service ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3278155) Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-032RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-03Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-043Summons Issued as to United States Natural Resources Conservation Service. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-104First AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Natural Resources Conservation Service. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates.(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-105CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to 4 Amended Complaint filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-186SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northwest Environmental Advocates re United States Natural Resources Conservation Service. (Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-057NOTICE of Appearance by John T Drake on behalf of United States Natural Resources Conservation Service (Attorney John T Drake added to party United States Natural Resources Conservation Service(pty:dft))(Drake, John) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-058Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order Setting Deadlines by Northwest Environmental Advocates. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Agreed Order)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-059NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Ruth Waldref on behalf of United States Natural Resources Conservation Service (Attorney Vanessa Ruth Waldref added to party United States Natural Resources Conservation Service(pty:dft))(Waldref, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-0710ORDER GRANTING 8 JOINT MOTION AND SETTING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar