Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02990
Date Filed2019-10-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning efforts to combat foreign influence campaigns by Russia, North Korea, China, or any other nation online. PDP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DHS granted PDP's request for expedited processing. DHS HQ also told PDP that its request was too broad to allow for a search. DOJ also acknowledged receipt of the requests. But after hearing nothing further from either agency, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6418739) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to U.S. Department of Justice, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-09Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-093SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-114Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-215MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel E. Goodman, :Firm- Protect Democracy Project, Inc., :Address- 115 Broadway, 5th Floor, New York, NY 10006. Phone No. - 2025794582. Fax No. - 9297778428 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-6466069. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Rachel E. Goodman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-216GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/21/2019. (jag) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-22MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Rachel E. Goodman is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/22/2019. (JAG) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2019. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/2019. (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/28/2019 (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/28/2019 (Schwartztol, Laurence) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2911NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Goodman on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Goodman, Rachel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar