Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOPEZ-PENA v. TRUMP et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02884
Date Filed2019-09-24
Date Closed2019-11-13
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJULIO C. LOPEZ-PENA
DefendantDONALD TRUMP Chief Executive Officer of the United States, Office of the President
DefendantWILLIAM BARR United States Attorney General, Department of Justice
DefendantWILLIAM P. BARR United States Attorney General, Department of Justice
DefendantSUSAN B. GERSON Assistant Director, Office of the United States Attorneys
DefendantJOHN DOE Associate Director,
DefendantDAVID L. HARLOW Deputy Director, United States Marshal Service
DefendantWILLIAM E. BORDLEY Associate General Counsel, United States Marshal Service
DefendantJOHN DOE Director of the Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [4]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-23Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/23/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JULIO C. LOPEZ-PENA (zsb) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-09-242MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JULIO C. LOPEZ-PENA (zsb) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-09-243PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JULIO C. LOPEZ-PENA (zsb) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-11-134MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/19. (zmd) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-135ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/19. (zmd) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar