Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRayan v. Saul et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv04475
Date Filed2019-10-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffMaha Z. Rayan
DefendantAndrew Marshall Saul Current Commissioner, U.S. Social Security Administration (SSA); Office of the Regional Counsel- Region IV
DefendantChristopher G. Harris Assistant Regional Counsel
TERMINATED: 11/01/2019
DefendantChristopher G. Harris Assistant Regional Counsel
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-041APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Maha Z. Rayan. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-08Submission of 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-082ORDER GRANTING 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refrain from forwarding the Complaint to the United States Marshal's Service for service until the District Judge orders otherwise. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/8/2019. (adg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-083COMPLAINT filed by Maha Z. Rayan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-09Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re 2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (adg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-09Submission of 3 Complaint for a frivolity determination, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (adg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-094STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/9/2019. (adg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-09Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re 4 Order. (adg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-245Objections to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Court Judge, Justin S. Anand and Prompt Motion by Maha Z. Rayan (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(jdb) Modified on 10/31/2019 to include motion (jdb). (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-016ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to state claims for fraud, violation of the Privacy Act, violation of Section 1106 of the Social Security Act, and Aggravated Identity Theft. The Court further finds that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs violation of the Freedom of Information Act claim. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims for fraud, violation of the Freedom of Information Act, and violation of Sections 552a(g)(l)(A) & (D) of the Privacy Act are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint properly asserting a claim for violations of Section 552a(g)(l)(C) of the Privacy Act and Section 1106 of the Social Security Act against the Social Security Administration. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this claim will also be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). It is further ORDERED that Christopher G. Harris is DISMISSED as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/1/19. (jta) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-01Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re 6 Order. (jta) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar