Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLlamas et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2019cv01916
Date Filed2019-10-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Wendy W. Berger
PlaintiffNoelle Llamas
PlaintiffTalia Lavin
PlaintiffKenneth Klippenstein
Case DescriptionNoelle Llamas, an assistant to journalists Talia Lavin and Kenneth Klippenstein, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning a tweet sent by ICE that disparaged Lavin's reporting. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and initially identified it as a request for alien files. Llamas, Lavin, and Klippenstein explained to the agency that the request was not for an alien file and the agency agreed to process it. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Llamas, Lavin, and Klippenstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-071COMPLAINT against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, # 3 Proposed Summons SUMMONS)(Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit text, summons not correct and not issued(TSW). (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-072NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-1916-Orl-78EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-083PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kenneth Klippenstein, Talia Lavin, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit text(TSW). (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-084PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kenneth Klippenstein, Talia Lavin, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit text (TSW). (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-095SUMMONS issued to US Attorney's Office and William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (TSW) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-096PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kenneth Klippenstein, Talia Lavin, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-107SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (AEJ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-118RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/11/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed). (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-119INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/11/2019. (RMF)(Copies mailed). (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-1410NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kenneth Klippenstein, Talia Lavin, Noelle Llamas. Related case(s): no (Bourdon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-1411CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Interested persons order by Kenneth Klippenstein, Talia Lavin, Noelle Llamas identifying Corporate Parent The Young Turks, Corporate Parent The New Yorker for Kenneth Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas, Talia Lavin.. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-18FEES paid by Kenneth Klippenstein (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ORL086215) (BIA) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar