Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHJD Capital Electric, Inc. v. United States Department of the Air Force, et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CitySan Antonio
Case Number5:2019cv01196
Date Filed2019-10-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David A. Ezra
PlaintiffHJD Capital Electric, Inc.
Case DescriptionHJD Capital Electric submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Air Force, Department of Army, and Department of Defense for records concerning a contract between the Air Force and Barlovento pertaining to the scope of work for a contract for renovation of facilities near San Antonio. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, HJD Capital Electric filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Air Force
DefendantUnited States Department of the Army
DefendantU.S. Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-071COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12695646), filed by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richard, Jana) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-072MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Richard, Jana) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-073REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Richard, Jana) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-07Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-07If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-094Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Defense, United States Department of the Air Force, United States Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mgr) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-095ORDER Setting Hearing on 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-106MOTION to Continue hearing on Temporary Injuction by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Continuance - TI hearing Nov 5)(Richard, Jana) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-11Text Order GRANTING 6 Motion to Continue entered by Judge David A. Ezra. A order resetting the hearing will follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ps) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-117ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING, ( Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/12/2019 1:30 PM before Judge David A. Ezra,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-298STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal by HJD Capital Electric, Inc.. (Richard, Jana) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar