Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03024
Date Filed2019-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the final report/memo for nine identified IG investigations, audits, or complaints. BuzzFeed also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6437648) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-092NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-093LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-10Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-275NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/27/2019)
2019-11-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 10/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/17/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar