Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03028
Date Filed2019-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning repatriation referring to deceased individuals who died in the custody of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Leopold also requested a fee waiver. U.S. Customs and Border Protection acknowledged the request sent to it but none of the other agencies acknowledged Leopold's requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6439746) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-102NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-103LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-11Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-114SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-11-205ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-21MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 5, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 21, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-12-056Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 5, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 6, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2020-02-057NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney W. Mark Nebeker (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-058Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 6, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 6, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-04-069Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 8, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 6, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/8/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-06-0810Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 8, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/10/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-08-1011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 9, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 11, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/9/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-10-0912Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 12, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/10/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-11-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 10, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/10/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-12-0914Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 10, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 9, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/10/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2021-02-1015Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 12, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 10, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/12/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-04-1216Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 12, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 12, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/12/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-05-1017Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-05-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 30, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 11, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/30/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-06-3018NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-3019Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-07-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 29, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 30, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/29/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 08/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar