Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03029
Date Filed2019-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning Steven Menashi, the agency's acting General Counsel who had just been nominated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency denied American Oversight's expedited processing request for two of its requests but did not address the other two requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6439932) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-11Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-214STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/21/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-215NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 10/21/2019 (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-297NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Talmadge Roberts on behalf of All Defendants (Roberts, Charles) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar