Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStacey & Jacobsen PLLC v. United States of America et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv01628
Date Filed2019-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard A. Jones
PlaintiffStacey & Jacobsen PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Stacey & Jacobsen submitted a FOIA request on behalf of their clients to U.S. Coast Guard for records pertaining to a collision on the Columbia River involving a tug boat and a recreational vessel. After hearing nothing from the agency for some time, the agency finally acknowledged receipt of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Stacey & Jacobsen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Coast Guard
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-111COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # 0981-5962567) Attorney James Patrick Jacobsen added to party Stacey & Jacobsen, PLLC(pty:pla), filed by Stacey & Jacobsen, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Jacobsen, James) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-15Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-15NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Stacey & Jacobsen PLLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/22/2019. (GT) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-152Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants United States of America, Department of Homeland Security, and United States Coast Guard. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-183CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Stacey & Jacobsen PLLC (Jacobsen, James) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-184STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-085AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Defendants on 10/15/2019 (Attorney General served 10/21/2019, US Attorney served 10/22/2019), filed by Plaintiff Stacey & Jacobsen PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Barr, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Moran)(Jacobsen, James) Modified on 11/8/2019 (MW). (Entered: 11/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar