Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHE JAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03060
Date Filed2019-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffAUSTRALIAN BROADCASTING CORPORATION
PlaintiffMARK WILLACY
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Mark Willacy, a reporter for the Australian Broadcasting Corporation, submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the Department of State, The Department of the Army, the National Security Agency, Central Command, and the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Defense. All but the Department of the Army, NSA, and Central Command acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the James Madison Project and the Australian Broadcasting Corporation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-141COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6445812) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, MARK WILLACY, AUSTRALIAN BROADCASTING CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification (ABC), # 3 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification (JMP), # 4 Summons CIA, # 5 Summons DoD, # 6 Summons State, # 7 Summons USADC, # 8 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AUSTRALIAN BROADCASTING CORPORATION, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, MARK WILLACY (zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-244STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/24/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar