Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. Perdue et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv02925
Date Filed2019-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning unbranded and/or unclaimed horses in or around the Heber Wild Horses Territory, the Devil's Garden Plateau Wild Horse Territory, and the Tonto National Forest. The agency acknowledged receipt of all three requests and indicated that responding would take some time. In response to the request pertaining to the Heber Wild Horses Territory, the agency provided a partial response of 536 documents. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGeorge Ervin Perdue, III in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Agriculture
DefendantUnited States Forest Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-151COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6945454)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Barr, # 2 Summons Dunn, # 3 Summons Perdue, # 4 Summons Forest Service, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-152Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-163SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-234MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/19 Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference. Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-11-135SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) George Ervin Perdue, III served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-136SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Forest Service served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-207STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants United States Forest Service, George Ervin Perdue, III. United States Forest Service answer due 12/12/2019; George Ervin Perdue, III answer due 12/12/2019. (Ross, Katherine) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar