Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03093
Date Filed2019-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel for records concerning the USA Freedom Act from June 2015 to the present. Eddington also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Eddington's request for expedited processing. Eddington filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of his expedited processing request. The agency upheld the denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6450400) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-152NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-17Case assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-11-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/30/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
2019-11-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/30/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
2019-11-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar