Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03114
Date Filed2019-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionFederation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the agency's collection and use of DNA samples. FAIR also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told FAIR that it was deferring a decision on its request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-161COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6455614) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-18Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-184STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 18, 2019. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar