Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVasquez Negrete v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2019cv02447
Date Filed2019-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sam A. Lindsay
PlaintiffGerardo Vasquez Negrete
Case DescriptionGerardo Vasquez Negrete submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Vasquez Negrete also submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning an arrest in 2012. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Vasquez Negrete filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUS Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-161COMPLAINT against US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Executive Office for Immigration Review filed by Gerardo Vasquez Negrete. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10341548) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s), # 8 Exhibit(s), # 9 Exhibit(s), # 10 Exhibit(s), # 11 Exhibit(s), # 12 Exhibit(s), # 13 Exhibit(s), # 14 Exhibit(s), # 15 Exhibit(s), # 16 Exhibit(s)) (Natarajan, Ranjana) Modified parties on 10/17/2019 (mla). (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-163New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-172Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10342954) filed by Gerardo Vasquez Negrete (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Lauren Joyner added to party Gerardo Vasquez Negrete(pty:pla) (Joyner, Lauren) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten image on 10/17/2019) (dsr). (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-174Summons issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mla) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-185ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren Joyner. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/18/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-256SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Executive Office for Immigration Review ; served on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-257SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Immigration and Customs Enforcement; served on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-258SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services; served on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-289STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/28/2019) (mla) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar