Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDE JARAY et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03130
Date Filed2019-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffSTEVEN A.W. DE JARAY
PlaintiffPERIENNE DE JARAY
Case DescriptionSteven and Perienne de Jaray submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning themselves and their affiliated business entities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the de Jarays that it had located 1,518 potentially responsive records. The de Jarays agreed to pay any fees incurred in processing their request. However, after the agency told the de Jarays that their request would not be completed until 2021, they filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-181COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6461798) filed by STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY, PERIENNE DE JARAY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (redacted), # 3 Exhibit C (redacted), # 4 Exhibit D (redacted), # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons USAO-DC, # 7 Summons USAG-01, # 8 Summons USAG-02)(Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-182SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PERIENNE DE JARAY, STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (SEALED), # 2 Exhibit B (SEALED), # 3 Exhibit C (SEALED), # 4 Exhibit D (SEALED), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-183MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Philip J. Bezanson, :Firm- Bracewell LLP, :Address- 701 5th Avenue, Suite 6200, Seattle, Washington 98104. Phone No. - 206-204-6206. Fax No. - 800-404-3970 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6462017. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PERIENNE DE JARAY, STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-184MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David B. Springer, :Firm- Bracewell LLP, :Address- 111 Congress Avenue, Suite 2300, Austin, Texas 78701. Phone No. - 512-494-3680. Fax No. - 800-404-3970 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6462066. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PERIENNE DE JARAY, STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-29Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-295STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-296SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-297REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to FBI filed by STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY, PERIENNE DE JARAY.(Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-298SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (ztth) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-30MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4(f), personal identifiers should be redacted from electronically filed documents. No additional privacy interests justify filing Plaintiffs' exhibits to their Complaint under seal. The Clerk is directed not to docket the attached exhibits. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/30/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-069NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-0810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/30/2019. (Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-0811RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/30/2019 (Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-0812RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/5/2019. (Braga, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar