Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGrass v. Gonzales et al
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2019cv00983
Date Filed2019-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief District Judge William P. Johnson
PlaintiffJames Grass
Case DescriptionJames Grass filed suit against Bernalillio County Sheriff Manny Gonzales for illegal use of surveillance technologies. His claim mentions FOIA and the U.S. Marshals Service but there is no claim that he submitted a FOIA request. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantManny Gonzales Sheriff BCSO
DefendantMatt Pohl
DefendantFNU LNU all other corprate officers of "Great Living" subsidery of BCSO
DefendantGreat Living LLC
DefendantPresbyterian Hospital
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-181COMPLAINT against Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Manny Gonzales, Great Living LLC, FNU LNU, Matt Pohl, Presbyterian Hospital, filed by James Grass. (dr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-18United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-182PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (dr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-183MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Grass. (dr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-184CM/ECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM by James Grass (dr) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-22United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. (ln) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-285***FILED IN ERROR*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Living LLC, Matt Pohl, Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Presbyterian Hospital, Manny Gonzales, FNU LNU., filed by James Grass. (meq) Modified on 11/8/2019 (arp). (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-086AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Living LLC, Matt Pohl, Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Presbyterian Hospital, Manny Gonzales, FNU LNU., filed by James Grass. (arp) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-147SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Living LLC, Matt Pohl, Bernalillo County Sheriff's Office, Presbyterian Hospital, Manny Gonzales, FNU LNU., filed by James Grass. (meq) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar