Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Times Company et al v. Department of the Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv09669
Date Filed2019-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Analisa Torres
PlaintiffNew York Times Company
PlaintiffMark Walker
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Mark Walker submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning email and calendar entries for ten named agency officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but rejected it as being too broad. Walker filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [14]
Opinion/Order [16]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [29]
Opinion/Order [31]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-181COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17799216)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Walker.(Schulz, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-182FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schulz, David) Modified on 10/21/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-183FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Walker.(Schulz, David) Modified on 10/29/2019 (ldi). (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-184REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Treasury, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Mark Walker. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Schulz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The New York Times Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David A. Schulz to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; only one Nature of Suit may be selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (dnh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (dnh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-215ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Treasury. (dnh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-216CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-237INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/23/2019) (cf) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-238ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/23/2019) (cf) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-29***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David A. Schulz to RE-FILE Document 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-299RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. (Owner of Ten Percent Plus Stock) for New York Times Company. Document filed by New York Times Company, Mark Walker.(Schulz, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-2910AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Department of the Treasury served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Times Company; Mark Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Schulz, David) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-0611NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of Department of the Treasury. (Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-2712ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Department of the Treasury.(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2020-01-0213LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for January 8, 2020, at 10:40 a.,m. addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David A. Schulz dated January 2 2020. Document filed by New York Times Company, Mark Walker.(Schulz, David) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-0214ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The deadline in paragraph 5 of the Court's initial pretrial conference order, ECF No. 7 (requiring a jointly proposed case management plan and standard scheduling order), is ADJOURNED sine die. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 8, 2020 is ADJOURNED to February 11, 2020, at 12:20 p.m. By February 7, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint letter setting forth a jointly proposed schedule or the parties' positions regarding a schedule. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 12:20 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/2/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-02-0615JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jennifer Jude dated 2/6/20. Document filed by Department of the Treasury..(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-0616ORDER granting 15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 11, 2020, is ADJOURNED to March 18, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. By March 9, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status letter. Initial Conference set for 3/18/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/6/2020) (cf) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-03-0917ORDER: The initial pretrial conference will be held telephonically. Accordingly, the parties are directed to call chambers at (212) 805-0293 on March 18, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. with all parties on theline. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/9/2020) (cf) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-0918JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Charles Crain dated March 9, 2020. Document filed by New York Times Company, Mark Walker..(Crain, Charles) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-0919ORDER granting 18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 18, 2020 is ADJOURNED to April 16, 2020, at 11:40 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically and the parties are to participate as instructed in the Court's March 9, 2020 order. ECF No. 17. By April 8, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status letter. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 11:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/9/2020) (cf) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-04-0820JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jennifer Jude dated 4/8/20. Document filed by Department of the Treasury..(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-1321ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The telephonic conference scheduled for April 16, 2020 is ADJOURNED to May 18, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. The parties are directed to call (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. By May 7, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status letter. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/13/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-13Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (cf) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-05-0722JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Charles Crain dated May 7, 2020. Document filed by New York Times Company, Mark Walker..(Crain, Charles) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-0823ORDER granting 22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The telephonic conference scheduled for May 18, 2020 is ADJOURNED TO June 11, 2020, at 11:40 a.m. The parties are directed to call (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. By June 5, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status letter. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/8/2020) (cf) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-08Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (cf) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-06-0524JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jennifer Jude dated 6/5/20. Document filed by Department of the Treasury..(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-0825ORDER granting 24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The telephonic conference scheduled for June 11, 2020 is ADJOURNED to July 14, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. The parties are directed to call (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. By July 6, 2020, the pa1iies shall submit a joint status letter. Initial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/8/2020) (cf) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-07-0626JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Charles Crain dated 7/6/2020. Document filed by New York Times Company, Mark Walker..(Crain, Charles) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-0627ORDER granting 26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 14, 2020 is ADJOURNED to August 20, 2020, at 10:20 a.m. By August 13, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/6/2020) (rro) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-06Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (rro) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-08-1328JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jennifer Jude dated 8/13/20. Document filed by Department of the Treasury..(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1429ORDER granting 28 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 20, 2020, is ADJOURNED to September 23, 2020, at 10:40 a.m. By September 14, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status letter. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/14/2020) (kv) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-09-1430JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Charles Crain dated 9/14/2020. Document filed by New York Times Company, Mark Walker..(Crain, Charles) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-1531ORDER granting 30 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 23, 2020, is ADJOURNED to October 22, 2020, at 10:20 a.m. By October 15, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status letter. The parties are directed to call (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/15/2020) (kv) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar