Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03155
Date Filed2019-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted eight FOIA requests to the Department of Energy for records concerning the involvement of Secretary Rick Perry and agency officials in trying to pressure Ukraine to conduct an investigation into Hunter Biden. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied American Oversight's requests for expediting processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6467916) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons U.S. Dep't of Energy, # 5 Exhibit Ex. A, # 6 Exhibit Ex. B, # 7 Exhibit Ex. C, # 8 Exhibit Ex. D, # 9 Exhibit Ex. E, # 10 Exhibit Ex. F, # 11 Exhibit Ex. G)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-23Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-11-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 10/30/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-085AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar