Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03192
Date Filed2019-10-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning independent monitor Michael Cherkasky's report for DOJ detailing HSBC's compliance with a 2012 agreement to fix money-laundering controls. Leopold also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Leopold's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [25]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6477593) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-242NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-243LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-275NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/8/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/7/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/8/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-12-099ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report by December 23, 2019. The joint status report shall include a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/09/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/23/2019 (tj) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-2310Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/23/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/18/2020 (tj) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-03-1811NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney W. Mark Nebeker (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-18SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in 12 the parties' Joint Status Report: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 29, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by June 26, 2020; Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment by July 17, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their reply by August 7, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/18/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 6/26/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 7/17/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 8/7/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 5/29/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/26/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/17/2020. (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-05-1413Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert); Modified text on 5/15/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by July 1, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by July 29, 2020; Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment by August 19, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their reply by September 9, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/14/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 7/29/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 8/19/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 9/9/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 7/1/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/29/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2020. (tj) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-06-2914Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by August 7, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by September 4, 2020; Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment by September 25, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their reply by October 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/29/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 9/4/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 9/25/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 10/16/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 8/7/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/4/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/25/2020. (tj) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-08-0715MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Vinay J. Jolly, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Vinay J. Jolly, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Vinay J. Jolly, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Vinay J. Jolly, # 7 Declaration of David K. Kessler, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of David K. Kessler, # 9 Exhibit B to Declaration of David K. Kessler, # 10 Declaration of Margaret A. Moeser, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-09-0116Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-01MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to 15 Defendant's motion for summary judgment and their cross-motion for summary judgment by September 11, 2020; Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment by October 2, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their reply by October 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/1/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 9/11/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 10/2/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 10/23/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/11/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/2/2020. (tj) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-1117MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-1118Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-2419Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-24MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its reply in support of 15 its motion for summary judgment and its opposition to 17 Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment by October 16, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of 17 their cross-motion for summary judgment by November 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 10/16/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/6/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/16/2020. (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-1620REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Benjamin Naftalis, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-1621Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (same as ECF No. 20) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Benjamin Naftalis, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-11-1222Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-12MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of 17 their motion for summary judgment on or before November 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/12/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 11/13/2020. (tj) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-1323REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2021-01-1324ORDER denying 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/13/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-1325MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/13/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/27/2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-2726Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/27/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/4/2021 (tj) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-0427Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 27 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/4/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-1128Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 28 the parties joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report that includes a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings on or before February 18, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/11/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1829Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-19SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in 29 the parties' joint status report: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file any renewed motion for summary judgment on or before June 3, 2021; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition and any renewed cross-motion for summary judgment on or before July 7, 2021; Defendant shall file its reply and cross-opposition on or before August 6, 2021; and Plaintiffs shall file any cross-reply on or before September 3, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/19/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar