Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03194
Date Filed2019-10-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records communications received by the Office of the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of Florida pertaining to the prosecution of Altaf Khanini, who was convicted for money laundering. EOUSA acknowledged receipt of the request but denied the request entirely under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). BuzzFeed filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld the denial. BuzzFeed then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6477707) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-242NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-243LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-065ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/6/19. (DM) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-276Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/8/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/8/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-11-279RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/8/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-12-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant requests an extension of 30 days through January 7, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter due to the case being reassigned to new counsel. Defendant indicates that Plaintiff does not oppose this request. For good cause shown, and with Plaintiff's consent, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than JANUARY 7, 2020 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 2, 2019. (lccck1) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 1/7/2020. (dot) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-2610NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sian Jones on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Jeremy Simon (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-0711ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-0912ORDER requiring the parties to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report no later than FEBRUARY 7, 2020 proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 9, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 2/7/2020. (dot) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-02-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-11MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, in which the parties explain that Defendant will report the number of documents potentially responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests within 45 days of the filing of this report and that the parties will then meet and confer regarding a production schedule. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS the parties' proposal that they submit a further joint status report in 60 days from the date of the report (or by no later than APRIL 7, 2020 ). Furthermore, until and unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court every 60 days thereafter . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 11, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2020. (dot) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-04-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-06-0815Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-08-0716Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-10MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 16 Joint Status Report. Following Defendant's supplemental response, as described in paragraph 8 of the Joint Status Report, the parties shall meet and confer regarding a schedule on dispositive briefing in this case. The parties shall submit another joint status report addressing such briefing schedule on or before OCTOBER 6, 2020 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 10, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2020. (dot) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-10-0617Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 17 Joint Status Report. Therein, the parties note that Defendant has nearly completed processing Plaintiff's document requests. The parties have also requested additional time to meet and confer regarding the potential for dispositive briefing in this matter. The parties shall submit another joint status report by or before NOVEMBER 24, 2020, to address these outstanding considerations. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 7, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/24/2020, to address these outstanding considerations. (dot) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-11-2418Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 18 Joint Status Report. As proposed therein, the parties shall file another joint status report by or before DECEMBER 23, 2020 further updating the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 24, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2020 further updating the Court. (dot) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-12-2319Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 19 Joint Status Report. As proposed therein, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 16, 2021 further updating the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 23, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2021, to further updating the Court. (dot) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2021-02-1620Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-17MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 20 Joint Status Report. As proposed therein, the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 18, 2021 further updating the Court. Thereafter, the parties shall continue to submit periodic joint status reports every 60 days until further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 17, 2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2021, updating the Court and every 60 days until further order from the Court. (dot) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-03-1821Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 21 Joint Status Report. Therein, the parties request a dispositive briefing schedule. In accordance therewith, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: On or before May 17, 2021, Defendant shall move for summary judgment. On or before July 16, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross motion. On or before August 16, 2021, Defendant shall file his reply in support of his motion for summary judgment and his opposition to any cross motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff. On or before September 15, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any cross motion for summary judgment he might file. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 20, 2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/20/2021)
2021-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 5/17/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/16/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2021. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 7/16/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 8/16/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/15/2021. (dot) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-05-1722MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration (Jolly), # 4 Declaration (Marcenaros), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
2021-07-1623Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-1624Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-08-1625Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-16MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant's 25 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that by or before August 23, 2021, Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs cross motion for summary judgment; and it is further ORDERED that on or before September 22, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 16, 2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to 23 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/23/2021. Plaintiff's Reply to 23 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/22/2021. Defendant's Reply to 22 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/23/2021. (dot) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-1926Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended MSJ and Reset Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian). Added MOTION for Briefing Schedule on 8/20/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Defendant's 26 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion for Summary Judgment and to Reset Briefing Schedule. Based on the content of that motion and Defendant's unopposed request to refile an amended motion for summary judgment motion, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the parties' pending 22 23 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. The parties may now re-file those cross-motions in accordance with their proposed briefing schedule: (1) On or before September 22, 2021, Defendant shall file an amended motion for summary judgment; (2) On or before October 27, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendants amended motion for summary judgment and any cross motion; (3) On or before November 10, 2021, Defendant shall file its reply in support of its amended motion for summary judgment and opposition to any cross motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff; and, (4) On or before November 24, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross motion for summary judgment it might file. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 20, 2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: On or before 9/22/2021, Defendant shall file an amended motion for summary judgment; (2) On or before 10/27/2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendants amended motion for summary judgment and any cross motion; (3) On or before 11/10/2021, Defendant shall file its reply in support of its amended motion for summary judgment and opposition to any cross motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff; and, (4) On or before 11/24/2021, Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross motion for summary judgment it might file. (kt) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar