Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv06971
Date Filed2019-10-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the agency's attempts to block shareholder proposals on issues like climate change. The Sierra Club also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Sierra Club's request for a fee waiver. The agency estimated that there were more than 200,000 potentially responsive emails and estimated it would take more than three years to complete the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-241COMPLAINT against United States Securities and Exchange Commission ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13821583.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-V, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-242Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/7/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-243**RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. 4 ** Proposed Summons. (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 10/24/2019) Modified on 10/24/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-244Proposed Summons. (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-245Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-246Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-247Summons Issued as to United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-11-068CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 11/6/2019) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-119CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierra Club Proof of Service on an Agency or Corporation of the United States (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 11/11/2019) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar