Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR EQUITABLE TREATMENT, INC. v. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03207
Date Filed2019-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR EQUITABLE TREATMENT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe American Center for Equitable Treatment submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office for records concerning PTO's FOIA logs since 2015 and any materials sent by PTO to the Department of Commerce to compile or generate its statistical data for the agency's annual FOIA reports. ACET also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency ACET filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-251COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6478690) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR EQUITABLE TREATMENT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons PTO, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Grossman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-252NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Wendell DeLaquil on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR EQUITABLE TREATMENT, INC. (DeLaquil, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-28Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE served on 10/31/2019 (Grossman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/4/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/4/2019. (Grossman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/4/2019. (Grossman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-047STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/4/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar