Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKobre & Kim LLP v. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv10151
Date Filed2019-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis A. Kaplan
PlaintiffKobre & Kim LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Kobre & Kim submitted a FOIA request to the Commodity Futures Trading Commission for records concerning the settlement agreement reached in the Kraft case. After the agency failed to respond, Kobre & Kim filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCommodity Futures Trading Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-311COMPLAINT against Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17873336)Document filed by Kobre & Kim LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sauter, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-312CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sauter, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-313RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kobre & Kim LLP.(Sauter, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-314FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commodity Futures Trading Commission, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Kobre & Kim LLP. (Sauter, Benjamin) Modified on 11/1/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-01CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (dnh) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-01Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (dnh) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-01Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-01***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Benjamin Jeffrey Aaron Sauter to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed on the summons PDF must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-015REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commodity Futures Trading Commission, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Kobre & Kim LLP. (Sauter, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-046ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement); Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiringa Report and Recommendation), All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/4/2019) (jca) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-047ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (dnh) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-068NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harrison McGill on behalf of Kobre & Kim LLP. (McGill, David) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-069NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan David Cogan on behalf of Kobre & Kim LLP. (Cogan, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-0610NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Sangyun Kim on behalf of Kobre & Kim LLP. (Kim, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-0611NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Stephen Buckley on behalf of Kobre & Kim LLP. (Buckley, Sean) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar