Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03307
Date Filed2019-11-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning Circular 175 requests. EPA also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-031COMPLAINT ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6501244) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, # 2 Summons US AG Summons, # 3 Summons State Dept Summons, # 4 Summons US Attorney Summons)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2019)
2019-11-032REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE CORRECTED re 1 Complaint, filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Summons US AG Summons CORRECTED, # 2 Summons US AG Summons CORRECTED)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2019)
2019-11-033CIVIL COVER SHEET CORRECTED by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES re 1 Complaint, filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES.(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2019)
2019-11-044NOTICE of Appearance by Hans Frank Bader on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-045CIVIL COVER SHEET corrected to substitute civil cover sheet mandated by this court, in place of the civil cover sheet used nationally that was previously submitted by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES re 3 Cover Sheet filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. Related document: 3 Cover Sheet filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES.(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-05Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-056SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-057STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/5/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-058LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (no parent company or corporate owner) by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-269RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/12/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/12/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/12/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/12/2019. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-12-0210NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar