Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHAYER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03325
Date Filed2019-11-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffANDY THAYER
Case DescriptionAndy Thayer submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Secret Service for records concerning a possible G20 Summit to be held at the McCormick Place complex in Chicago in 2021. Thayer also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied Thayer's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Thayer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6507073) filed by ANDY THAYER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-052NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of ANDY THAYER (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-053SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-064STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 6, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-12-125ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar