Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJin et al v. U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2019cv03214
Date Filed2019-11-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman
PlaintiffMs. Ying Jin
PlaintiffMr. Victor H. Sparrow, III
Case DescriptionYing Jin and Victor Sparrow submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning their application to remove temporary conditions of residency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jin and Sparrow filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantMr. Gregory Collett in his representative capacity as District Director
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-061COMPLAINT against Gregory Collett, U.S. Bureau of Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637119129.), filed by Ying Jin, Victor H. Sparrow, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-262Correspondence from Victor H. Sparrow, III re: Status of Issuance of Summons (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-12-043ORDER directing that Plaintiff shall submit completed summons to the Clerk and the Clerk shall issue summons and return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/4/2019. (c/m 12/5/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-114Summons Issued 60 days as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m to Plaintiff 12/11/2019 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar