Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThree Pine One, LLC v. General Services Administration of the United States of America
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2019cv01786
Date Filed2019-11-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Youlee Yim You
PlaintiffThree Pine One, LLC
Case DescriptionThree Pine One submitted FOIA request to the General Services Administration and U.S. Forest Service for records concerning GSA's decision to lease property in Portland that was used to house the U.S. Forest Service's Mt. Hood headquarters. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. GSA withheld some records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information) and Exemption 5 (privileges). Three Pine One filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, Three Pine One filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGeneral Services Administration of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-061Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6073053 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Three Pine One, LLC against General Services Administration of the United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Radmacher, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-062Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-063Summons Issued Electronically as to General Services Administration of the United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-154Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-12-095Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by General Services Administration of the United States of America. (Rice-Stitt, Austin) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar