Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv03180
Date Filed2019-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning surgeons, veterinarians, and biologists contracted to perform or assist with ovariectomy (spay) surgeries and follow-up care and research on wild horses at the Oregon Wild Horse and Burro facility from January 2018 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States
DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-081COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6987717)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-082Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-123SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-254NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-045Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Answer Deadline and Stay Proceedings until January 16, 2019, to Allow for Settlement Negotiations by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar