Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCampo v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CityKansas City
Case Number4:2019cv00905
Date Filed2019-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr
PlaintiffRobert Campo
Case DescriptionRobert Campo submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning emails from Darin Powers and Robert Huber, employees of DynCorp International. The emails had been withheld as privileged in Jordan v. Dept of Labor. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Campo argued that because several DOJ attorneys were not members of the bar, the emails lost their privilege when disclosed to them. The agency denied the requests, claiming the emails were also protected by Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Campo filed an administrative appeal. Campo then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-091COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Robert Campo. Filing fee $400, receipt number MOWDC-6577248. Service due by 2/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 Huber's email and Powers' email (redacted), # 3 Exhibit 2 Letter 10/28/2015 from DI to ALJ Merck, # 4 Exhibit 3 DI Opp 1/16/2018 (excerpts), # 5 Exhibit 4 Huber's Declaration 8/15/2017)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 11/09/2019)
2019-11-122NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-12SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-133MOTION for summary judgment filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Robert Campo. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Statement of Facts & Suggestions, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jack Jordan)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-12-024RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Robert Campo. U.S. Department of Justice served on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney 11/15/2019, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service US Attorney General 11/13/2019, # 3 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney General 11/19/2019)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-035MOTION to reassign/transfer case , MOTION to stay filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft))(Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-076SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case MOTION to stay filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Campo. Reply suggestions due by 12/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar