Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRashid El Malik v. Department of Veteran Affairs et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv09471
Date Filed2019-11-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Philip S. Gutierrez
PlaintiffRashid El Malik
Case DescriptionRashid El Malik, a disabled Vietnam vet, sued the Department of Veterans Affairs for injuries he received during treatment. El Malik submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning an alleged disclosure of his personal information by the agency. After hearing nothing further from the agency, El Malik filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of Veteran Affairs
DefendantDOES 1-5
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-041COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rashid El Malik against Defendant Department of Veteran Affairs. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demand. (Attachments: # 1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-042NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-043NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-04460 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant Department of Veteran Affairs. (jtil) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-075STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-076SEALED - MOTION TO PROCEED TO FILE APPLICATION WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COURT COST filed by plaintiff Rashid El Malik. (bm) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-137MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Motion [Docket 6] by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar