Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. Department of Labor
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv07417
Date Filed2019-11-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffShoshana Walter
Case DescriptionShosana Walter, a staff reporter for Reveal, submitted a FOIA request to the Wage and Hour Division of the Department of Labor for records concerning any wage and hour complaints filed against the employer Synanon from 1960 to 1989. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied it entirely by asserting a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records without citing any exemption as the basis of its Glomar response. Walter filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Investigative Reporting filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-111COMPLAINT against Department of Labor ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13876548.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting, Shoshana Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 11/11/2019) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
2019-11-112Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 11/11/2019) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
2019-11-113Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 11/11/2019) (Entered: 11/11/2019)
2019-11-124Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-125Civil Cover Sheet by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Shoshana Walter . (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-126CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Shoshana Walter.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-137Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-138Summons Issued as to Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-149CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Shoshana Walter (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 11/14/2019) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-12-0310NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 12/3/2019) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar