Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGrayson Flory v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv09735
Date Filed2019-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Philip S. Gutierrez
PlaintiffGrayson Flory
Case DescriptionGrayson Flory, a freelance writer, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning No More Deaths, a human rights organization. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency closed the request because Flory had not provided third-party authorizations and the request was too broad to conduct a search. Flory filed an administrative appeal. After the agency failed to acknowledge receipt of his appeal, Flory contacted the Office of Government Information Services. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Flory filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-131COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Grayson flory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party Grayson flory(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-132REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Grayson flory. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-133CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Grayson flory. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-134CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Grayson flory, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-135Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Grayson flory. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-136NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-137NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-138STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-15RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support 2 . (vm) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-189ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Denying 2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Reason: Inadequate showing of indigency. Other: See Attached Statement of Decision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (bm) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2010FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400 into the registry of the Court from Matthew Strugar. Re: Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), 9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . Receipt number 0973-24821872 paid via pay.gov. (cp) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-051130 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-051230 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Civil Process Clerk, United States Attorney's Office, Central District of California, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-051330 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to United States Attorney General, Washington, DC 20530. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar