Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03421
Date Filed2019-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning acting agency head Ken Cuccinelli, including communications, ethics concerns, decision memoranda, political leadership, and messages. American Oversight also submitted a FOIA request for records concerning communications to or from John Zadrozny mentioning Stephen Miller. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of all the requests except for the one pertaining to Zadrozny. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-131COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6558641) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-14Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-264NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar