Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMcNulty v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2019cv07496
Date Filed2019-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable John Z. Lee
PlaintiffMichael McNulty
Case DescriptionMichael McNulty, who had power of attorney for his father, William McNulty, submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning notes of correspondence between the agency, himself, his father, and Curtiss Ross, attorney for his father's ex-wife, pertaining to settlement of back taxes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency withheld records under Exemption 3 (other statutes) and Exemption 5 (privileges), based on attorney-client privilege. McNulty then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-131COMPLAINT filed by Michael McNulty; Jury Demand. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-132CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-133PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Michael McNulty. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-135SUMMONS Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-146NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-197SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael McNulty as to Internal Revenue Service served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Return of Service)(kp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-208MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 1/24/20 at 2:00 p.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar